SD SB85 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the calculation of the small school adjustment in the state aid to education formula, and to provide for the distribution of certain funds to school districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the calculation of the small school adjustment in the state aid to education formula, and to provide for the distribution of certain funds to school districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-22 Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. H.J. 544
2012-02-22 Appropriations Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 85cg
2012-02-22 Scheduled for hearing
2012-02-21 Deferred by Chair
2012-02-21 Scheduled for hearing
2012-02-15 First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 486
2012-02-14 Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 417 Amendment 85ctd
2012-02-14 Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 14. S.J. 416
2012-02-14 Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 411 Amendment 85ce
2012-02-09 Education Title amended, Passed Amendment 85cta
2012-02-09 Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 350
2012-02-09 Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 85ca
2012-02-09 Scheduled for hearing
2012-01-23 First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 124

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback