SD SB85 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the continuing education requirements for certain veterinarians.
Title
Revise the continuing education requirements for certain veterinarians.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Sen. Cooper Garnos [R] | Sen. Tom Hansen [R] |
Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Sen. Jim Peterson [D] | Rep. Steve Street [D] |
Sen. Bill Van Gerpen [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | Signed by Governor S.J. 673 | |
2010-03-08 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 585 | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 711 | |
2010-03-03 | Signed by President S.J. 558 | |
2010-03-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 651 | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 613 | |
2010-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-10 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 350 | |
2010-02-09 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 262 | |
2010-02-04 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 250 | |
2010-02-02 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-02 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Title amended, Passed Amendment 85tta | |
2010-02-02 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 206 | |
2010-02-02 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 85ta | |
2010-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-22 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 122 |