SD SB84 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriate funds to support Veterans Memorial Centers in South Dakota and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriate funds to support Veterans Memorial Centers in South Dakota and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Tabled (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs: Recommend Referral to (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01JointCommittee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 1.
2021-03-01JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-02-11JointCommittee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 84A
2021-02-11JointScheduled for hearing
2021-01-22SenateMilitary and Veterans Affairs Recommend Referral to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0.
2021-01-22SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-20SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 82

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback