SD SB84 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 743
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 743
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the suspension of the probationary period for juvenile probationers under certain conditions.
Title
Provide for the suspension of the probationary period for juvenile probationers under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 743 |
2017-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2017 S.J. 654 |
2017-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 675 |
2017-03-01 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 608 |
2017-02-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 581 |
2017-02-27 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 544 |
2017-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-02 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 278 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 257 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 228 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 181 |