SD SB84 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. S.J. 485
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. S.J. 485
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require municipalities to reimburse the counties for certain judicial and law enforcement expenditures.
Title
Require municipalities to reimburse the counties for certain judicial and law enforcement expenditures.
Sponsors
Sen. Jenna Netherton [R] | Sen. Bob Ewing [R] | Rep. Elizabeth May [R] | Rep. Kristin Conzet [R] |
Rep. Dennis Feickert [D] | Sen. Joshua Klumb [R] | Rep. James Schaefer [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. S.J. 485 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 138 |