SD SB84 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 488
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 488
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding administrative penalties when filing campaign finance disclosure statements.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding administrative penalties when filing campaign finance disclosure statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 488 | |
2011-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-10 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 357 | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 382 Amendment 84tta | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 382 | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 382 Amendment 84tb | |
2011-02-07 | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 330 | |
2011-02-07 | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. Amendment 84ta | |
2011-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 174 |