SD SB84 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - Senate Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 18. S.J. 430
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - Senate Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 18. S.J. 430
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to comparative negligence.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to comparative negligence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Reconsidered (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | Senate Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 18. S.J. 430 | |
2010-02-22 | Intent to reconsider S.J. 417 | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 17, NAYS 18. S.J. 416 | |
2010-02-19 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 389 | |
2010-02-18 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 364 | |
2010-02-18 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-22 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 122 |