SD SB83 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2017 S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2017 S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to the criteria for informal adjustment for any apparent child in need of supervision.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to the criteria for informal adjustment for any apparent child in need of supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2017 S.J. 654 |
2017-03-01 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 01, 2017 S.J. 598 |
2017-02-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 582 |
2017-02-27 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 577 |
2017-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 0. H.J. 537 |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-02-23 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 486 |
2017-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-03 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 295 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 278 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 247 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 181 |