SD SB83 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Signed by Governor S.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Signed by Governor S.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designate Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day as a working holiday.
Title
Designate Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day as a working holiday.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 694 |
2013-03-05 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 660 |
2013-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 |
2013-02-28 | House | Signed by President S.J. 630 |
2013-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 573 |
2013-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 559 |
2013-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 535 |
2013-02-22 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 496 |
2013-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 217 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 228 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 190 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 83ta |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 130 |