SD SB82 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Update outdated language related to domestic abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Update outdated language related to domestic abuse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-13HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 714
2015-03-09HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 632
2015-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 644
2015-03-05HouseSigned by President S.J. 613
2015-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 598
2015-03-03HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 581
2015-02-27HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 553
2015-02-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-02-04HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 287
2015-02-03SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 272
2015-01-30SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 253
2015-01-29SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 227
2015-01-29SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-01-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 92

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback