SD SB82 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Signed by Governor S.J. 673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Signed by Governor S.J. 673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning purchases, sales, and contracts made by public officers with the state or its political subdivisions and to revise certain provisions concerning agreements or other transactions of the South Dakota Housing Development Authority.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning purchases, sales, and contracts made by public officers with the state or its political subdivisions and to revise certain provisions concerning agreements or other transactions of the South Dakota Housing Development Authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 673 |
2014-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 581 |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 672 |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by President S.J. 563 |
2014-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 627 |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-03-03 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 599 |
2014-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-12 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 398 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 294 Amendment 82fta |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 293 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 293 Amendment 82fa |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 276 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 262 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 220 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 112 |