SD SB81 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish eligibility criteria for out-of-state health institutions to receive financing from the Health and Educational Facilities Authority.
Title
Establish eligibility criteria for out-of-state health institutions to receive financing from the Health and Educational Facilities Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 S.J. 558 |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522 |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 475 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 508 |
2020-03-05 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-03-05 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 433 |
2020-02-19 | House | First Reading House H.J. 315 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 239 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 81A |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 98 |