SD SB80 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3.
Hearing: Mar 3 House State Affairs Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for counties, reservations, and municipalities in the legislative redistricting process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for counties, reservations, and municipalities in the legislative redistricting process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3.
2021-03-03HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-08HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 238
2021-02-02HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 179
2021-02-01SenateSenate Title amended, Passed S.J. 147 Amendment 80C
2021-02-01SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 11. S.J. 146
2021-02-01SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 146 Amendment 80B
2021-01-28SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 137
2021-01-27SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 1
2021-01-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-20SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 82

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback