SD SB80 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 1. S.J. 516
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation to the Equal Access to Our Courts Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation to the Equal Access to Our Courts Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 1. S.J. 516
2019-02-25SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-19SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-14SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 163

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback