SD SB8 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 662
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 662
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt certain transactions entered into by the State Investment Council and Division of Investment from certain procurement requirements.
Title
Exempt certain transactions entered into by the State Investment Council and Division of Investment from certain procurement requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Title amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Title amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 662 |
2015-03-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 578 |
2015-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 581 |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by President S.J. 552 |
2015-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 1. H.J. 541 |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-02-25 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 508 |
2015-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 250 |
2015-01-29 | House | First read in House H.J. 230 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 221 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | State Affairs Title amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. Amendment 8FTA |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 164 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 8fb |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 17 |