SD SB79 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 21. S.J. 512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 21. S.J. 512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the penalty for theft of a firearm.
Title
Increase the penalty for theft of a firearm.
Sponsors
Sen. Stace Nelson [R] | Sen. Richard Curd [R] | Sen. Lynn Disanto [R] | Sen. Bob Ewing [R] |
Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] |
Sen. Lance Russell [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Rep. Kevin Jensen [R] | Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R] |
Rep. Taffy Howard [R] | Rep. Sam Marty [R] | Rep. Tina Mulally [R] | Sen. Herman Otten [R] |
Sen. Tom Pischke [R] | Rep. Tony Randolph [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 21. S.J. 512 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 477 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 445 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 163 |