SD SB78 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-1)
Status: Passed on February 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2021 S.J. 286
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modify certain provisions related to trusts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify certain provisions related to trusts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-08 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18SenateSigned by the Governor on February 18, 2021 S.J. 286
2021-02-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 11, 2021 S.J. 248
2021-02-10HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 279
2021-02-09SenateSigned by the President S.J. 229
2021-02-08HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 238
2021-02-05HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent H.J. 2
2021-02-05HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 2
2021-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-02HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 179
2021-02-01SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 145
2021-01-28SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 137
2021-01-26SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1.
2021-01-26SenateCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 78A
2021-01-26SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-19SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 65

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback