SD SB78 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt certain medical providers from licensure.
Title
Exempt certain medical providers from licensure.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Curd [R] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] | Sen. Deb Soholt [R] |
Rep. Jon Hansen [R] | Sen. Timothy Johns [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678 |
2019-03-05 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019 |
2019-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 622 |
2019-02-28 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 556 |
2019-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 554 |
2019-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 543 |
2019-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 486 |
2019-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 473 |
2019-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 453 |
2019-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443 |
2019-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 423 |
2019-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 398 |
2019-02-12 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 366 |
2019-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-30 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 267 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 216 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 197 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 156 |