SD SB78 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 17, 2017 S.J. 748
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding election petitions for conservation district supervisors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding election petitions for conservation district supervisors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor on March 17, 2017 S.J. 748
2017-03-10HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 727
2017-03-09HouseSigned by the President S.J. 710
2017-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 739
2017-03-08HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 677
2017-03-06HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 14. H.J. 652
2017-03-02HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 612
2017-02-28HouseLocal Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 564
2017-02-28HouseLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 78ja
2017-02-28HouseScheduled for hearing
2017-02-21HouseDeferred by Chair
2017-02-21HouseLocal Government Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 5.
2017-02-21HouseScheduled for hearing
2017-02-07HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 324
2017-02-06SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 314
2017-02-03SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 293
2017-02-03SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 179

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=78&Session=2017
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB78P.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB78HLO.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB78ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=22829&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=22913&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23465&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23840&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24091&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24193&Session=2017&Session=2017

Bill Comments 750

feedback