SD SB78 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 662
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize counties or medical providers to recover inmate healthcare costs from insurers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize counties or medical providers to recover inmate healthcare costs from insurers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-11HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 662
2015-03-05HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 594
2015-03-04HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 601
2015-03-03HouseSigned by President S.J. 574
2015-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 0. H.J. 556
2015-02-26HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2015-02-26HouseLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 536
2015-02-26HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-02-04HouseReferred to House Local Government H.J. 286
2015-02-03HouseFirst read in House H.J. 268
2015-01-30SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 250
2015-01-28SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2015-01-28SenateLocal Government Title amended, Passed Amendment 78sta
2015-01-28SenateLocal Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 200
2015-01-28SenateLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 78ya
2015-01-28SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-01-21SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 78

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback