SD SB78 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Signed by Governor S.J. 506
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal certain outdated and obsolete provisions regarding the Commissioner of South Dakota.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal certain outdated and obsolete provisions regarding the Commissioner of South Dakota.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-03HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 506
2014-02-25HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 444
2014-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 517
2014-02-21HouseSigned by President S.J. 416
2014-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 470
2014-02-19HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2014-02-19HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 446
2014-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing
2014-02-06HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 316
2014-02-05SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 226
2014-02-04SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2014-02-04SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 194
2014-02-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 111

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback