SD SB78 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-04 - Signed by Governor S.J. 634
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions relating to medical requirements for intrastate drivers transporting passengers and to update certain references to federal statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions relating to medical requirements for intrastate drivers transporting passengers and to update certain references to federal statutes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-04HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 634
2013-02-26HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 574
2013-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 536
2013-02-22HouseSigned by President S.J. 545
2013-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 491
2013-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 472
2013-02-19HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443
2013-02-15HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 425
2013-02-14HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 414
2013-02-13HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 375
2013-02-12HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 360
2013-02-07HouseTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 338
2013-02-07HouseScheduled for hearing
2013-01-29HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 232
2013-01-28SenateSenate Title amended, Passed S.J. 255 Amendment 78ra
2013-01-28SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 9. S.J. 255
2013-01-28SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 255 Amendment 78xa
2013-01-25SenateTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 219
2013-01-25SenateScheduled for hearing
2013-01-17SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 129

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback