SD SB78 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 659
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allow an arrest to be expunged when the criminal case is dismissed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow an arrest to be expunged when the criminal case is dismissed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-02 Signed by Governor S.J. 659
2012-02-28 Delivered to the Governor S.J. 592
2012-02-27 Signed by Speaker H.J. 639
2012-02-24 Signed by President S.J. 563
2012-02-23 House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 585
2012-02-22 Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 545
2012-02-22 Scheduled for hearing
2012-02-01 First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 275
2012-01-31 Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 235
2012-01-26 Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 188
2012-01-26 Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 78sa
2012-01-26 Scheduled for hearing
2012-01-23 First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 123

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback