SD SB77 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 542
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 542
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enhance the penalty on registered sex offenders who commit sexual contact without consent from a person capable of consenting.
Title
Enhance the penalty on registered sex offenders who commit sexual contact without consent from a person capable of consenting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 542 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2022 S.J. 462 |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 589 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 445 |
2022-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 509 |
2022-02-28 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 325 |
2022-02-04 | House | First Reading House H.J. 212 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 175 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 77A |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 46 |