SD SB77 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - House of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 443 Amendment 77I
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Require certain font size for initiated measure petitions and constitutional amendment petitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require certain font size for initiated measure petitions and constitutional amendment petitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseHouse of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 443 Amendment 77I
2021-03-01HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 10. H.J. 442
2021-02-25HouseLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
2021-02-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-10HouseReferred to House Local Government
2021-02-09HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 254
2021-02-08SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 13. S.J. 210
2021-02-08SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 209 Amendment 77G
2021-02-03SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2.
2021-02-03SenateAmend the amendment, Passed Amendment 77C
2021-02-03SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 77B
2021-02-03SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-01SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-19SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 65

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://sdlegislature.gov/#/Session/Bill/21810
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/211612.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/216331.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/216969.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/218812.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/214919.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/216173.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/216950.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/216944.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/218768.pdf
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/68288
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/68671
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/70106
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/70315

Bill Comments

feedback