SD SB77 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 19. H.J. 724
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 19. H.J. 724
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the establishment of a scholarship program for postsecondary technical institute students and to make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Provide for the establishment of a scholarship program for postsecondary technical institute students and to make an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Referred to House Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Education Referred as Amended to Senate Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Referred to House Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Education Referred as Amended to Senate Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 19. H.J. 724 | |
2012-03-02 | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 720 Amendment Cc77B | |
2012-03-01 | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 711 | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 626 | |
2012-02-29 | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 680 | |
2012-02-28 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 4. H.J. 660 | |
2012-02-27 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 624 | |
2012-02-27 | Appropriations Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 77ba | |
2012-02-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to House Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 543 | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 485 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 2. S.J. 424 | |
2012-02-13 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 379 | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-09 | Education Referred as Amended to Senate Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 352 | |
2012-02-09 | Education Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 77tb | |
2012-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 122 |