SD SB76 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 545
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 545
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to the retirement of justices and judges.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to the retirement of justices and judges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Judiciary Tabled (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 545 | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-06 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 314 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 266 | |
2012-01-31 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 227 | |
2012-01-31 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. Amendment 76rc | |
2012-01-31 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-01-26 | Judiciary Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 2. | |
2012-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 122 |