SD SB76 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 722
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 722
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the composition of the State Veterans' Commission.
Title
Revise the composition of the State Veterans' Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 722 | |
2010-03-08 | State Affairs Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 8. | |
2010-03-08 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-17 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 448 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 335 | |
2010-02-12 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 322 | |
2010-02-10 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 275 | |
2010-02-10 | State Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 76jc | |
2010-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-21 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 109 |