SD SB75 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-8)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Vetoed for Style and Form on March 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for a habitat stamp on hunting and fishing licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for a habitat stamp on hunting and fishing licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-30 - House - House Approval of style and form veto (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseVetoed for Style and Form on March 24, 2020
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor on March 31, 2020
2020-03-30HouseDelivered Style and Form S.J. 568
2020-03-30HouseApproval of style and form veto, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 7. H.J. 630
2020-03-30HouseVetoed for Style and Form on March 23, 2020 S.J. 556
2020-03-10HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2020 S.J. 474
2020-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 533
2020-03-05HouseSigned by the President S.J. 445
2020-03-04HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 412
2020-03-02HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 14. H.J. 441
2020-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 429
2020-02-25HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5.
2020-02-25HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 75F
2020-02-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-18HouseReferred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 296
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading House
2020-02-05SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 4. S.J. 147
2020-02-04SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
2020-02-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-01-27SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 91

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=75&Session=2020
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/63650.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/68621.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/69488.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/70247.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=32312&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=32424&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=33726&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34120&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34364&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=35047&Session=2020

Bill Comments

feedback