SD SB74 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2021 S.J. 300
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding drones.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding drones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateSigned by the Governor on February 22, 2021 S.J. 300
2021-02-16SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 16, 2021 S.J. 258
2021-02-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 288
2021-02-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 251
2021-02-10HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 273
2021-02-09HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
2021-02-09HouseTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
2021-02-09HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-03HouseReferred to House Transportation H.J. 195
2021-02-02HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 179
2021-02-01SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 149
2021-01-27SenateTransportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2021-01-27SenateTransportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 74D
2021-01-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-19SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 66

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback