SD SB74 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding multiple convictions for certain offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding multiple convictions for certain offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 21, 2019 S.J. 733
2019-03-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 672
2019-03-07HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 701
2019-03-06HouseSigned by the President S.J. 637
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 2. H.J. 644
2019-03-04HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 598
2019-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 551
2019-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 15. S.J. 511
2019-02-22SenateRemove from Consent Calendar S.J. 477
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-21SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 445
2019-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-23SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 156

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback