SD SB74 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the consideration of joint physical custody of a minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the consideration of joint physical custody of a minor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-12HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 644
2014-03-06HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 568
2014-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 660
2014-03-04HouseSigned by President S.J. 540
2014-03-03HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 2. H.J. 609
2014-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 594
2014-02-26HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 567
2014-02-26HouseScheduled for hearing
2014-02-06HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 316
2014-02-05SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 228
2014-02-04SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 193
2014-02-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-01-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 91

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback