SD SB71 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 31, NAYS 36. H.J. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 31, NAYS 36. H.J. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designate Juneteenth as a working holiday.
Title
Designate Juneteenth as a working holiday.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Rep. Fred Deutsch [R] | Rep. Hugh Bartels [R] | Rep. Doug Barthel [R] |
Sen. Richard Curd [R] | Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] | Rep. Jon Hansen [R] | Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] |
Rep. Lance Koth [R] | Rep. John Mills [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R] |
Sen. Marsha Symens [R] | Rep. Marli Wiese [R] | Sen. John Wiik [R] | Rep. Nancy York [R] |
Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-01 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 31, NAYS 36. H.J. 470 |
2021-03-01 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2021-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-02 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 179 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 8. S.J. 146 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 146 Amendment 71A |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 137 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 1 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 16 |