SD SB71 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the offenses for which an order for interception of communications may be granted.
Title
Revise the offenses for which an order for interception of communications may be granted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557 |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522 |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 475 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 522 |
2020-03-04 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-05 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 171 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 2. S.J. 134 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 75 |