SD SB71 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 659
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 659
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modify the requirements relating to the publication of the administrative rules.
Title
Modify the requirements relating to the publication of the administrative rules.
Sponsors
Sen. Angie Buhl [D] | Rep. Peggy Gibson [D] | Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] | Rep. Roger Hunt [R] |
Sen. Larry Lucas [D] | Rep. Shawn Tornow [R] | Sen. Mike Vehle [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor S.J. 659 | |
2012-02-28 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 592 | |
2012-02-27 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 639 | |
2012-02-24 | Signed by President S.J. 563 | |
2012-02-23 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 573 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-22 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 542 | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 485 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 409 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 385 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 334 | |
2012-02-07 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 296 | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 276 | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 247 | |
2012-01-30 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 209 | |
2012-01-26 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 190 | |
2012-01-25 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 169 | |
2012-01-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-20 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 97 |