SD SB70 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise and reorganize certain provisions regarding the assessment of property for the purposes of taxation.
Title
Revise and reorganize certain provisions regarding the assessment of property for the purposes of taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Taxation: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Taxation: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Taxation: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Taxation: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 S.J. 468 |
2021-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 541 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 445 |
2021-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 4. H.J. 488 |
2021-03-02 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. |
2021-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to House Taxation H.J. 238 |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading House H.J. 166 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 136 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 1 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 18 |