SD SB7 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 231
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Permit a government agency to qualify as a victim for purposes of restitution in criminal cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permit a government agency to qualify as a victim for purposes of restitution in criminal cases.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenateSigned by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 231
2021-02-05SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 05, 2021 S.J. 199
2021-02-04HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 218
2021-02-03SenateSigned by the President S.J. 174
2021-02-02HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 182
2021-02-01HouseRemove from Consent Calendar H.J. 167
2021-01-28HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-01-28HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0.
2021-01-28HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-22HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 109
2021-01-21SenateSenate Title amended, Passed S.J. 90 Amendment 7D
2021-01-21SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 90
2021-01-19SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
2021-01-19SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 2 Amendment 7B
2021-01-19SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 15

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback