SD SB7 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Signed by Governor S.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Signed by Governor S.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the registration of a place of business with the Real Estate Commission.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the registration of a place of business with the Real Estate Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 694 |
2013-03-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 634 |
2013-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-27 | House | Signed by President S.J. 615 |
2013-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 543 |
2013-02-25 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-25 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 512 |
2013-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-17 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 97 |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 117 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 108 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 24 |