SD SB69 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 S.J. 370
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 S.J. 370
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend certain provisions pertaining to the South Dakota Retirement System.
Title
Amend certain provisions pertaining to the South Dakota Retirement System.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 S.J. 370 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 14, 2024 S.J. 325 |
2024-02-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 323 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 301 |
2024-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 295 |
2024-02-06 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-06 | House | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-01-30 | House | First read in House and referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 199 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 191 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 21 |