SD SB69 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2018 S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2018 S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow certain registration and permit documents to be stored and presented electronically.
Title
Allow certain registration and permit documents to be stored and presented electronically.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2018 S.J. 756 |
2018-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 06, 2018 S.J. 736 |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 689 |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 646 |
2018-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 2. H.J. 628 |
2018-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 611 |
2018-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 592 |
2018-02-22 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 545 |
2018-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 153 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 178 |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 148 |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 65 |