SD SB69 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor S.J. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor S.J. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding elections and election petitions.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding elections and election petitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 41 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 42 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-06 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 41 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 42 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-06 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 736 |
2015-03-13 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 731 |
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 785 |
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by President S.J. 726 |
2015-03-13 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 7. S.J. 724 |
2015-03-13 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 721 Amendment Cc69a |
2015-03-13 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 16. H.J. 777 |
2015-03-13 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 772 Amendment cc69a |
2015-03-12 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 739 |
2015-03-12 | House | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 686 |
2015-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 41, NAYS 25. H.J. 708 |
2015-03-10 | House | Immediate Reconsideration (Rule 5-13.1) H.J. 708 |
2015-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 24. H.J. 707 |
2015-03-10 | House | Intent to reconsider H.J. 706 |
2015-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 34. H.J. 705 |
2015-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 704 Amendment 69fn |
2015-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 703 Amendment 69fp |
2015-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 701 Amendment 69fo |
2015-03-06 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 634 |
2015-03-06 | House | Amend the amendment, Passed Amendment 69on |
2015-03-06 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 69fj |
2015-03-06 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 69fl |
2015-03-06 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 69fm |
2015-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-05 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 305 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 8. S.J. 290 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 289 Amendment 69fg |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 289 Amendment 69ff |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 274 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 253 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 201 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 69fe |
2015-01-28 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 69ca |
2015-01-28 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 69fd |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-21 | Senate | State Affairs Deferred to another day, Passed |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 29 |