SD SB68 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 S.J. 370
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 S.J. 370
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend certain provisions pertaining to the South Dakota Retirement System to comply with federal law.
Title
Amend certain provisions pertaining to the South Dakota Retirement System to comply with federal law.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 S.J. 370 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 14, 2024 S.J. 325 |
2024-02-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 323 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 301 |
2024-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 295 |
2024-02-06 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-06 | House | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-01-30 | House | First read in House and referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 199 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 191 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 21 |