SD SB68 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 20. S.J. 186
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 20. S.J. 186
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the creation and funding of Oceti Sakowin community-based schools.
Title
Provide for the creation and funding of Oceti Sakowin community-based schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Rep. Peri Pourier [D] | Sen. Shawn Bordeaux [D] | Sen. Red Foster [D] |
Rep. Steven Haugaard [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Rep. Tony Randolph [R] | Sen. VJ Smith [R] |
Rep. Tamara St. John [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsidered (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Education: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsidered (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Education: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 20. S.J. 186 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 186 Amendment 68B |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 186 Amendment 68A |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Deferred with pending amendment (Rule 5-17), Passed S.J. 156 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 16. S.J. 155 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Intent to reconsider S.J. 150 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 20. S.J. 148 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 126 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 1 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Education Deferred to another day, Passed |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 14 |
Subjects
Boards of School Districts
Charter Schools
Criminal Background Investigation
Education
Native Americans
Promulgation of Rules
School Districts
State Aid to Education
Charter Schools
Criminal Background Investigation
Education
Native Americans
Promulgation of Rules
School Districts
State Aid to Education