SD SB68 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 49-9)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2019 S.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Define certain acts as misbranding of food products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Define certain acts as misbranding of food products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 18, 2019 S.J. 732
2019-03-07HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 07, 2019 S.J. 642
2019-03-06HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 670
2019-03-05HouseSigned by the President S.J. 618
2019-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 604
2019-02-28HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-28HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 583
2019-02-28HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-21HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 462
2019-02-20SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 434
2019-02-14SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 384
2019-02-14SenateAmend the amendment, Passed Amendment 68ba
2019-02-14SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 68ka
2019-02-14SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-23SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 154

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback