SD SB68 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the uniform real property electronic recording act, to use an existing funding source to implement the provisions of this Act, and to revise certain provisions concerning electronic recording.
Title
Adopt the uniform real property electronic recording act, to use an existing funding source to implement the provisions of this Act, and to revise certain provisions concerning electronic recording.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 688 |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 652 |
2014-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 750 |
2014-03-11 | House | Signed by President S.J. 629 |
2014-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 670 |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-03-05 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 645 |
2014-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-07 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 339 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 242 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 220 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 86 |