SD SB68 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 659
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 659
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide that no statute of limitations applies to certain rape offenses.
Title
Provide that no statute of limitations applies to certain rape offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor S.J. 659 | |
2012-02-28 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 592 | |
2012-02-27 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 639 | |
2012-02-24 | Signed by President S.J. 563 | |
2012-02-23 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 10. H.J. 585 | |
2012-02-22 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. H.J. 545 | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-06 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 313 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 264 | |
2012-01-31 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 226 | |
2012-01-31 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. Amendment 68ra | |
2012-01-31 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-20 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 96 |