SD SB68 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Signed by Governor S.J. 484
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Signed by Governor S.J. 484
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to standards for new construction.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to standards for new construction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Signed by Governor S.J. 484 | |
2010-02-25 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 476 | |
2010-02-24 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 606 | |
2010-02-23 | Signed by President S.J. 451 | |
2010-02-22 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 18. H.J. 542 | |
2010-02-19 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 498 | |
2010-02-18 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 476 | |
2010-02-17 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 455 | |
2010-02-16 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 409 | |
2010-02-12 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 387 | |
2010-02-11 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 365 | |
2010-02-11 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-04 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 316 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 235 Amendment 68jtb | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 4. S.J. 235 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 235 Amendment 68je | |
2010-01-28 | Commerce Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 176 | |
2010-01-28 | Commerce Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 68oa | |
2010-01-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-20 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce S.J. 95 |