SD SB67 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2022 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2022 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to the Department of Game, Fish and Parks to improve and repair infrastructure around Lake Alvin and Newell Lake and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to the Department of Game, Fish and Parks to improve and repair infrastructure around Lake Alvin and Newell Lake and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2022 S.J. 494 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 02, 2022 S.J. 435 |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 509 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 416 |
2022-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 481 |
2022-02-24 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 404 |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading House H.J. 344 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 259 |
2022-02-10 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. J.J. 1 |
2022-02-10 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 9 |
Subjects
Appropriation
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Game, Fish, Parks and Forestry
Procurement of Public Improvements
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Game, Fish, Parks and Forestry
Procurement of Public Improvements