SD SB67 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-6)
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 S.J. 428
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-6)
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 S.J. 428
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permit a victim of child sex trafficking or exploitation to expunge any criminal or delinquency record obtained as a result of the victimization.
Title
Permit a victim of child sex trafficking or exploitation to expunge any criminal or delinquency record obtained as a result of the victimization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 S.J. 428 |
2018-02-06 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 06, 2018 S.J. 383 |
2018-02-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 347 |
2018-02-02 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 358 |
2018-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 298 |
2018-01-31 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 241 |
2018-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 153 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 181 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 130 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 67oa |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 64 |