SD SB67 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reduce the minimum size for improvement districts.
Title
Reduce the minimum size for improvement districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Gray [R] | Sen. Ried Holien [R] | Sen. Russell Olson [R] | Rep. Tad Perry [R] |
Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] | Rep. Charles Turbiville [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-07 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 622 | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 621 | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 599 | |
2011-02-28 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 559 | |
2011-02-25 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 537 | |
2011-02-24 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 1. H.J. 509 | |
2011-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-01 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 248 | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 252 | |
2011-01-26 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 218 | |
2011-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-21 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 163 |